Great American Insurance Company of New York v. BBB Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: BBB Industries, LLC and Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00574
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Ideal Auto Supply, Inc..(Rush, Jennifer)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Summons issued electronically as to BBB Industries, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand Corrected Version filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Corson, Brett)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 REFILED SEE DOC. NO. 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BBB Industries, LLC, Ideal Auto Supply, Inc. with jury demand filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Corson, Brett) Modified on 7/19/2019 to add: Refiled text (js).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint - New Case. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019.(js)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Amend #2 Summons - Waiver Issued, #1 Complaint - New Case, with cert. of service filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Corson, Brett)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Ideal Auto Supply, Inc..(Rush, Jennifer)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Ideal Auto Supply, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rush, Jennifer)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Stephen A. Duggan on behalf of Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.(Duggan, Stephen)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Rush on behalf of Ideal Auto Supply, Inc. Attorney Jennifer Rush added to party Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rush, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Corrective Entry to #7 Answer to Complaint. Entry corrected by adding FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE FILING TO DOC. NO. 5 (js)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE FILING TO DOC. NO. 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Ideal Auto Supply, Inc..(Duggan, Stephen) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add: Filed in error text (js).
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A. Duggan on behalf of Ideal Auto Supply, Inc. (Duggan, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Ideal Auto Supply, Inc..(Duggan, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Ideal Auto Supply, Inc. by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Served/Mailed on 6/10/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Corson, Brett)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company of New York disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. with cert. of service (Corson, Brett)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Great American Insurance Company of New York shall file a disclosure statement by June 5, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 6/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to BBB Industries, LLC, Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
May 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-574-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1819824 filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - BBB Industries, LLC, #3 Summons - Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.)(Corson, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. BBB Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBB Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Auto Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Duggan
Represented By: Jennifer Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Brett Richard Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?