Ticked Off, Inc. v. TickCheck, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ticked Off, Inc.
Defendant: Opentip.Com, JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc., Live Safely Products, Inc. and TickCheck, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00627
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 MOTION to Extend Time to File an Answer or Other Motion (Extension of time to retain a legal counsel). Text of Order: Granted. The deadline for counsel to file an Appearance and Answer to the complaint has been extended to September 2, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Appearance of Counsel Follow Up: 9/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/2/2019. (kad)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to August 19, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/19/2019. (kad)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to August 19, 2019 to Respond to Complaint filed by Live Safely Products, Inc..(Kenney, Michele)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/23/2019.(kad)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement by JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Carroll, Laura)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc..(Carroll, Laura)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura L. Carroll on behalf of JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc. Attorney Laura L. Carroll added to party JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc.(pty:dft).(Carroll, Laura)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Extend Time to File an Answer or Other Motion (Extension of time to retain a legal counsel) filed by Opentip.Com. Served on 7/29/2019 via CM/ECF. Follow up on Objection on 8/5/2019. (ko)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to TickCheck, LLC by Ticked Off, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Spear, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc. by Ticked Off, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/27/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Spear, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Assented to MOTION for Alexander J. Marek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Alexander J. Marek submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 7/22/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(kad)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 12, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/12/2019. (kad)
July 11, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error NO ACTION REQUIRED re: #17 Assented to MOTION for Alexander J. Marek to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by TickCheck, LLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Alexander J. Marek to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1835317.) filed by TickCheck, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Affidavit of Alexander J. Marek, Esq.)(Casolaro, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 12, 2019 filed by TickCheck, LLC.(Casolaro, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by TickCheck, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Casolaro, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas F. Casolaro on behalf of TickCheck, LLC Attorney Nicholas F. Casolaro added to party TickCheck, LLC(pty:dft).(Casolaro, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James F. Laboe on behalf of Ticked Off, Inc. Attorney James F. Laboe added to party Ticked Off, Inc.(pty:pla).(Laboe, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/5/2019. (kad)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Live Safely Products, Inc..(Kenney, Michele)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Live Safely Products, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Kenney, Michele)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele E. Kenney on behalf of Live Safely Products, Inc. Attorney Michele E. Kenney added to party Live Safely Products, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kenney, Michele)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Opentip.Com. Counsel to file an appearance or the file will be referred to a judicial officer for further action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 7/23/2019.(kad)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #8 Letter. Text of Order: Doc. No. 8 is stricken from the record as a nonconforming document pursuant to LR 5.2 and without prejudice to refiling an answer or motion to dismiss through counsel as is required by LR 83.6(c) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN (See 7/2/2019 Order) - Letter to Clerk of Court from Phenix Chen re: "Motion to Remove Opentip.com from Defendant List. (kad) Modified on 7/2/2019 to add: "STRICKEN (See 7/2/2019 Order)" (kad).
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Opentip.Com by Ticked Off, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/18/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Spear, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Live Safely Products, Inc. by Ticked Off, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/17/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Spear, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Ticked Off, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Spear, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Ticked Off, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Ticked Off, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by June, 14, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 6/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc., Live Safely Products, Inc., Opentip.Com, TickCheck, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
June 7, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-627-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1823920 filed by Ticked Off, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Spear, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ticked Off, Inc. v. TickCheck, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opentip.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Laura L. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Safely Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michele E. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TickCheck, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas F. Casolaro
Represented By: Alexander J. Marek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ticked Off, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Spear
Represented By: James F. Laboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?