US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor v. C&C Flooring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor
Defendant: Christopher Coburn and C&C Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00629
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to C&C Flooring, Inc. with certificate of service by US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor. Served/Mailed on 6/10/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Landry, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christopher Coburn with certificate of service by US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor. Served/Mailed on 6/10/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Landry, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph R Landry on behalf of US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor Attorney Joseph R Landry added to party US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor(pty:pla).(Landry, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to C&C Flooring, Inc., Christopher Coburn. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-629-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A List of Employees, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver , #4 Summons - Waiver)(Pedulla, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor v. C&C Flooring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&C Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Mark A. Pedulla
Represented By: Joseph R Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?