Tri-Town EMS et al v. Arch Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pembroke, NH, Town of and Tri-Town EMS
Defendant: Arch Insurance Group, Inc. and Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00661
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Assented to MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until November 15, 2019 filed by Arch Insurance Company.(Mallory, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Abigail E. Rocap to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1849410.) filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Abigail E. Rocap)(Mallory, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for David M. Alt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1849405.) filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of David M. Alt)(Mallory, Mark)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 8/16/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ///STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, re: Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (removed) Stipulation for Dismissal of Arch Insurance Group, Inc. by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc.(Mallory, Mark) Modified on 7/16/2019 to add: "///"(kad).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Affirmative Defenses filed by Arch Insurance Company.(Mallory, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Tri-Town EMS disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burrows, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles P. Bauer on behalf of Pembroke, NH, Town of, Tri-Town EMS Attorney Charles P. Bauer added to party Pembroke, NH, Town of(pty:pla), Attorney Charles P. Bauer added to party Tri-Town EMS(pty:pla).(Bauer, Charles)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Mallory, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019.(kad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2019 filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc..(Mallory, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2019-CV-00288, Merrimack County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. True Copy Attest: Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2. True Copy Attest: Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3. True Copy Attest: Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4. True Copy Attest: State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 5. True Copy Attest: Summons)(Mallory, Mark)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc. submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $400, receipt no. 0102-1827168, re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper. (bt)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Arch Insurance Group, Inc., Arch Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Tri-Town EMS shall file a disclosure statement by July 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Arch Insurance Group, Inc., Arch Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Arch Insurance Group, Inc., Arch Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by June 24, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 6/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (bt)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-661-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2019-CV-00288 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1827243) filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. State Court Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2. Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3. Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mallory, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #5 Completed Civil Cover Sheet) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Town EMS et al v. Arch Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pembroke, NH, Town of
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Town EMS
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Mallory
Represented By: David M. Alt
Represented By: Abigail E. Rocap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?