Putnam v. Hillsborough County et al
Plaintiff: Jodie Putnam
Defendant: Nicole Scolaro, Alexa Rennie, Dorothea Malo, Christopher Braga, Katelyn Hrubiec, Hillsborough County and Denise Hartley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00664
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Text of Order: Pursuant to LR 15.1(c) Defendant Christopher Bragas Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. No. 9) is denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Jodie Putnam.(Vogelman, Lawrence)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher Braga. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion. Follow up on Objection on 8/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Tucker, Abby)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/17/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd J. Hathaway on behalf of Christopher Braga Attorney Todd J. Hathaway added to party Christopher Braga(pty:dft).(Hathaway, Todd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abby Tucker on behalf of Christopher Braga Attorney Abby Tucker added to party Christopher Braga(pty:dft).(Tucker, Abby)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A. Curran on behalf of Denise Hartley, Hillsborough County, Katelyn Hrubiec, Dorothea Malo, Alexa Rennie, Nicole Scolaro (service waivers previously filed) Attorney John A. Curran added to party Denise Hartley(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Hillsborough County(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Katelyn Hrubiec(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Dorothea Malo(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Alexa Rennie(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Nicole Scolaro(pty:dft).(Curran, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Denise Hartley, Hillsborough County, Katelyn Hrubiec, Dorothea Malo, Alexa Rennie, Nicole Scolaro by Jodie Putnam. Served/Mailed on 7/16/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cengher, Carly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Christopher Braga, Denise Hartley, Hillsborough County, Katelyn Hrubiec, Dorothea Malo, Alexa Rennie, Nicole Scolaro. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ej)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ej)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-664-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carly Marie Cengher on behalf of Jodie Putnam Attorney Carly Marie Cengher added to party Jodie Putnam(pty:pla).(Cengher, Carly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1827587 filed by Jodie Putnam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver and Notice of Lawsuit)(Vogelman, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #3 CORRECTED Complaint with Signature) (ej). Modified on 6/18/2019 to add: (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putnam v. Hillsborough County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Scolaro
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Rennie
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothea Malo
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Braga
Represented By: Abby Tucker
Represented By: Todd J. Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelyn Hrubiec
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Hartley
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Putnam
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Carly Marie Cengher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?