State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company v. Felix Septic Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Felix Septic Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00750
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Steven K. Gerber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1856304.) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 9/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Steven K. Gerber)(Sherman, John)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/30/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. Hurley on behalf of Felix Septic Services, Inc. (Hurley, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Felix Septic Services, Inc..(Hurley, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Felix Septic Services, Inc. by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/31/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sherman, John)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by July 22, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Felix Septic Services, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ej)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ej)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-750-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1837044 filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Sherman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company v. Felix Septic Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Septic Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?