Vigilant, Inc. v. Copley Consulting Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vigilant, Inc.
Defendant: Copley Consulting Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00753
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/3/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 10/5/2020. JERS Statement due 10/5/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/19/2020. (js)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving with changes #6 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4-5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/30/2019. Discovery deadline 6/1/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 4/2/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 6/3/2020. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/30/2019.(js)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Vigilant, Inc.. (Gormley, Lawrence)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/3/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-cv-00285, Strafford County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit Certified Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Certified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Certified Summons, #5 Exhibit Certified Return of Service)(Sears, Michele)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Copley Consulting Group, Inc..(Sears, Michele)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Vigilant, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gormley, Lawrence)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Copley Consulting Group, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sears, Michele)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Copley Consulting Group, Inc. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Vigilant, Inc shall file a disclosure statement by August, 7, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Copley Consulting Group, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Copley Consulting Group, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by July, 24, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-753-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford Superior Court, case number 219-2019-cv-00285 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1837888) filed by Copley Consulting Group, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Summons, #2 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sears, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigilant, Inc. v. Copley Consulting Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigilant, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence B. Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copley Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Carlucci Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?