Dyer et al v. Luckern Steel Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37, Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund, Brian Donahue, Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund, Veronica Dyer, Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England and Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Luckern Steel Services, LLC and Pittsfield Column, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00764
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Jasper J. Groner, Esq. or Kathryn S. Shea, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within seven (7) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 7/25/2019. (ej)
July 18, 2019 Miscellaneous Case No. 1:19-mc-6-PB is contested. Documents 1-5 have been transferred to Civil Case No. 1:19-cv-764-PB. The Miscellaneous case has been terminated. All future docketing must be in the new civil case. Please show the new civil case number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #4 PETITION to Attach With Notice Hearing set for 7/30/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Trustee Disclosure by Northway Bank(vln)
June 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The new case designation is: 19-mc-6-PB. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ej)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION to Attach With Notice filed by Brian Donahue, Veronica Dyer, International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37, Ironworkers District Council of New England, Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund. Follow up on Objection on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Groner, Jasper)
April 29, 2019 WRIT of Execution Issued as to Pittsfield Column, Inc.. (ej)
April 29, 2019 WRIT of Execution Issued as to Luckern Steel Services, LLC. (ej)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance and Proposed Writ of Execution by Brian Donahue, Veronica Dyer, International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37, Ironworkers District Council of New England, Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund (Groner, Jasper) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #1 COMPLETED Writ of Execution, #2 Affidavit in Support of Writ of Execution) (ej). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #3 CORRECTED Writ of Execution) (ej).
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance and Proposed Writ of Execution by Brian Donahue, Veronica Dyer, International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37, Ironworkers District Council of New England, Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund (Groner, Jasper) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #1 COMPLETED Writ of Execution, #2 Affidavit in Support of Writ of Execution) (ej). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #3 CORRECTED Writ of Execution) (ej).
February 22, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-mc-6-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment with judgment attached filed by Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund, Ironworkers District Council of New England, Veronica Dyer, Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund, International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37, Brian Donahue. Receipt No. 14649017452, $47. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer et al v. Luckern Steel Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Ironworkers Local 7 and Local 37
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers District Council of New England Pension Fund
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Donahue
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers District Council of New England Education Fund
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Dyer
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers District Council of New England Annuity Fund
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers District Council of New England
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers District Council of New England Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Represented By: Jasper J. Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luckern Steel Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsfield Column, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?