Netto v. RdF Corporation
Plaintiff: Holly Netto
Defendant: Rdf Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00784
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by RdF Corporation.(Closson, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RdF Corporation 08/28/2019 by Holly Netto. Served/Mailed on 7/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meyer, H.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to RdF Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Holly Netto (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Meyer, H.)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-784-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Holly Netto. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. (ej)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1841081 filed by Holly Netto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Wolkowski, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #3 CORRECTED Civil Cover Sheet with signature) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netto v. RdF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rdf Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Netto
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Represented By: Andrea Amodeo-Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?