Locke Roman v. Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alicia Locke Roman
Defendant: Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00799
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/10/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 10/9/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/23/2020.(vln)
September 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #8 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. It is ordered that this case be referred to United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73. Added Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Terminated Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-799-AJ, please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. Text of Order: Approved. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
September 3, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 10/1/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/3/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan with changes. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/13/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/2/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 5/4/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 12/2/2019.(ko)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (ko)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #6 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc., Alicia Locke Roman. Document incomplete. Filer shall refile and add to docket text: Replaces document no. 6. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 9/3/2019.(ko)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) filed by Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.. (Van Oot, Martha)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 REFILED SEE DOC. NO. #8 . CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for all purposes by Alicia Locke Roman, Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.(ko) Modified on 9/6/2019 to add: refiled text (ko).
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2019-cv-00235, Grafton County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Certified State Court Record Part 1, #2 Certified State Court Record Part 2, #3 Certified State Court Record Part 3, #4 Certified State Court Record Part 4)(Van Oot, Martha)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/12/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Van Oot, Martha)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc..(Van Oot, Martha)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-799-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Grafton County Superior Court, case number 215-2019-cv-00235 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1842792) filed by Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court from NHCHR, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Oot, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke Roman v. Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw's Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Van Oot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Locke Roman
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?