TRT Development Company, Inc. et al v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Omni Mount Washington, LLC and TRT Development Company, Inc.
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00851
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Development Company, Inc. Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (vln)
October 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The telephone conference scheduled for October 11, 2019 at 10:15 am is cancelled and will be rescheduled. (vln)
October 11, 2019 RESCHEDULING NOTICE (TIME CHANGE ONLY) re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Development Company, Inc. Telephone Conference set for 10/11/2019 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (vln)
October 10, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Development Company, Inc. Telephone Conference set for 10/11/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The court will provide dial-in information to counsel by email. (vln)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- The pretrial conference scheduled for 10/10/2019 is cancelled. Order to issue (js)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Development Company, Inc.. (Fish, Viggo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Gregory Deschenes to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 MOTION for Kurt Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Gregory P. Deschenes, Esq. & Kurt M. Mullen, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/23/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #9 MOTION for Gregory Deschenes to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #10 MOTION for Kurt Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Kurt Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1861614.) filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 9/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of K. Mullen)(Strauss, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Gregory Deschenes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1861607.) filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 9/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Deschenes)(Strauss, Michael)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/3/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by ACE American Insurance Company.(Strauss, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Omni Mount Washington, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rouvalis, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by TRT Development Company, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rouvalis, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 214-2019-CV-00087, Coos County Superior Court(Strauss, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Friday, September 6, 2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to Friday, September 6, 2019 filed by ACE American Insurance Company.(Strauss, Michael)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by ACE American Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. TRT Development Company, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by September 9, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 9/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Viggo Fish, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.Compliance Deadline set for 9/18/2019.(mc)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-851-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Strauss, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Coos County, case number 214-2019-cv-00087 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1849829) filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 9/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Adverse Parties, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Strauss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRT Development Company, Inc. et al v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Mount Washington, LLC
Represented By: Viggo Christensen Fish
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRT Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Viggo Christensen Fish
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Strauss
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Represented By: Gregory P. Deschenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?