Stellar Records, LLC v. Nuernberg et al
Plaintiff: Stellar Records, LLC
Defendant: Lori J. Nuernberg, Eric Nuernberg and Lori Paquette
Case Number: 1:2019cv00990
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (mc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Report of Filing to Register of Copyrights by Stellar Records, LLC.(Hopkins, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Stellar Records, LLC disclosing no parent company,, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Shawn)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michael T. Hopkins submits an ECF registration form within 10 days So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/7/2019. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(mc)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #2 MOTION for Michael T. Hopkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff filed by Stellar Records, LLC. Declaration of Attorney Michael Hopkins should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Eric Nuernberg, Lori J. Nuernberg. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Stellar Records, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Stellar Records, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by September 30, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 9/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-990-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Michael T. Hopkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1865999.) filed by Stellar Records, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 10/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Shawn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #1 PDF Text Searchable Motion) (mc).
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1865936 filed by Stellar Records, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exibit index, #2 Exhibit Craigslist Ad, #3 Exhibit Paypal Records, #4 Exhibit SMS text Records, #5 Exhibit Package Tracking Info, #6 Exhibit Infringed Recordings, #7 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons - Waiver Summons Eric Nuernberg, #10 Summons - Waiver Summons Lori Nuernberg)(Sullivan, Shawn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #11 PDF Text Searchable Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stellar Records, LLC v. Nuernberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Nuernberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Nuernberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stellar Records, LLC
Represented By: Shawn J. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?