Beaudry v. Donna
Plaintiff: John R. Beaudry
Defendant: Daniel D. Donna, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01013
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/5/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Daniel D. Donna, Jr.(Staar, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William A. Staar on behalf of Daniel D. Donna, Jr Attorney William A. Staar added to party Daniel D. Donna, Jr(pty:dft).(Staar, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda M. Smith on behalf of Daniel D. Donna, Jr Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Daniel D. Donna, Jr(pty:dft).(Smith, Linda)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Daniel D. Donna, Jr by John R. Beaudry. Served/Mailed on 10/4/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Frizzell, Jonathan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Daniel D. Donna, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1013-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1869086 filed by John R. Beaudry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver (Notice of Lawsuit), #3 Summons - Waiver (Waiver - not yet executed))(Frizzell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaudry v. Donna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel D. Donna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Beaudry
Represented By: Jonathan S. Frizzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?