Larkin v. Christie et al
Plaintiff: Michael L. Larkin
Defendant: Officer John Doe, Nueces County Sherriff, TX, State of, Worcester County, Massachusetts, Spencer Christie, Corpus Christie Police Department, Worcester County District Attorney, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Nueces County, Ben Word, US Marshal, Texas, US Distrcit of Maine, Corpus Christie, Mike Tenuta, Joseph D. Early, Michael Salloum, E. Smith, Thomas P. Velardi, Strafford County, NH and Jennifer B. Chase
Case Number: 1:2019cv01024
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk from Michael Larkin re: Custodial Financial Certificate. (de)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for for Relief Regarding IFP Documents. Text of Order: Plaintiff Michael Larkin's request (Doc. No. 5) for an Order directing the Strafford County DOC to submit a Certificate of Custodial Institution in this matter is DENIED as moot, as the Strafford County DOC submitted that form to the court on November 5, 2019. See Doc. No. 6. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to M. Larkin, initial fee of $1.00. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. Finance Follow Up Deadline 1/6/2020 (ej)
November 5, 2019 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. New case number is 1:19-cv-1024-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Custodial Institution re: #3 Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs by Sandy Miller, records supervisor on behalf of Michael L. Larkin (ej)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: Plaintiff has filed a motion (Doc. No. 5) asserting that the Strafford County Department of Corrections (SCDOC) treasurer has not processed the Certificate of Custodial Institution that he asserts he has provided to that office, for the purpose of filing a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) in this case. Without expressing any opinion on the merits of plaintiff's motion or his underlying claims, the court directs the clerks office to contact the SCDOC custodian of inmate trust accounts to confirm that office has received a copy of the trust account certificate and to provide a new blank copy of that form to that office, as necessary, so that plaintiff may assemble a complete IFP application. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ej)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Relief Regarding IFP Documents filed by Michael L. Larkin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ej)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jennifer B. Chase, Corpus Christie, Spencer Christie, Corpus Christie Police Department, Joseph D. Early, Nueces County, Nueces County Sherriff, Officer John Doe, Michael Salloum, E. Smith, Strafford County, NH, TX, State of, Mike Tenuta, Texas, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, US Distrcit of Maine, US Marshal, Thomas P. Velardi, Worcester County District Attorney, Worcester County, Massachusetts, Ben Word filed by Michael L. Larkin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (ej)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Incomplete IFP: MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Prisoner Consent Form filed by Michael L. Larkin. Still needs Certificate of Custodial. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Consent Form, #2 Envelope)(ej)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form. Compliance Deadline set for 11/29/2019. (bt)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corpus Christie, Spencer Christie, Corpus Christie Police Department, Nueces County, Nueces County Sherriff, Officer John Doe, TX, State of, Mike Tenuta, Texas, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, US Distrcit of Maine, US Marshal, Worcester County District Attorney, Worcester County, Massachusetts, Ben Word filed by Michael L. Larkin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. Christie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nueces County Sherriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TX, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worcester County, Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpus Christie Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worcester County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nueces County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Distrcit of Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpus Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Tenuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Salloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Velardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County, NH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer B. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?