Uzuyem v. Harbor Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Felicia Uzuyem
Defendant: Harbor Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01044
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 12/6/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Harbor Homes, Inc..(Pandolph, William)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/25/2019. (js)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2019-CV-00627, Hillsborough South County Superior Court(Pandolph, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 25, 2019 filed by Harbor Homes, Inc..(Pandolph, William)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
October 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1044-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Harbor Homes, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Pandolph, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court, Southern District, case number 226-2019-CV-00627 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1872050) filed by Harbor Homes, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 10/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pandolph, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzuyem v. Harbor Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Uzuyem
Represented By: Lauren S. Irwin
Represented By: Heather M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Homes, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?