Merrow v. Wolfeboro, NH, Town of
Plaintiff: Becky Merrow
Defendant: Town of Wolfeboro and Wolfeboro, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2019cv01057
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/7/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Wolfeboro, NH, Town of.(Schwarz, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark T. Broth on behalf of Wolfeboro, NH, Town of Attorney Mark T. Broth added to party Wolfeboro, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Broth, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wolfeboro, NH, Town of by Becky Merrow. Served/Mailed on 10/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meyer, H.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Wolfeboro, NH, Town of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1057-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1874004 filed by Becky Merrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Meyer, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #3 PDF Text Searchable Complaint, #4 /s/ Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Lawsuit) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrow v. Wolfeboro, NH, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wolfeboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfeboro, NH, Town of
Represented By: Daniel P. Schwarz
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Merrow
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?