White v. Strafford County Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Robyn White
Defendant: Haden Wilber, Matthew Locke, Thomas Lydon, Wentworth Douglass Hospital, John Doe, Strafford County Department of Corrections, James Doe, Thomas J. Lyndon, John Roe, Rockingham County Department of Corrections and James Roe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01059
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Wentworth Douglass Hospital.(Hanlon, Melissa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa M. Hanlon on behalf of Wentworth Douglass Hospital Attorney Melissa M. Hanlon added to party Wentworth Douglass Hospital(pty:dft).(Hanlon, Melissa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Catherine Goering on behalf of Matthew Locke, Haden Wilber Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Matthew Locke(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Haden Wilber(pty:dft).(Goering, Emily)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T. Broadhead on behalf of Matthew Locke, Haden Wilber Attorney Matthew T. Broadhead added to party Matthew Locke(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T. Broadhead added to party Haden Wilber(pty:dft).(Broadhead, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina M. Wilson on behalf of Matthew Locke, Haden Wilber Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Matthew Locke(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Haden Wilber(pty:dft).(Wilson, Christina)
November 15, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance for John D. Cassidy and Christopher M. Bracci filed by Thomas J. Lyndon. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D. Cassidy and Christopher M. Bracci on behalf of Thomas J. Lyndon (Cassidy, John) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add: Christopher M. Bracci (lw).
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Thomas J. Lyndon.(Cassidy, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Strafford County Department of Corrections by Strafford County Department of Corrections. Served/Mailed on 10/16/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Friedman, Christine)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Friedman on behalf of Strafford County Department of Corrections Attorney Christine Friedman added to party Strafford County Department of Corrections(pty:dft).(Friedman, Christine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rockingham County Department of Corrections by Robyn White. Served/Mailed on 10/16/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A. Curran on behalf of Rockingham County Department of Corrections Attorney John A. Curran added to party Rockingham County Department of Corrections(pty:dft).(Curran, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wentworth Douglass Hospital by Robyn White. Served/Mailed on 10/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Robyn White.(Vogelman, Lawrence)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew Locke, Haden Wilber by Robyn White. Served/Mailed on 10/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Strafford County Department of Corrections. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Robyn White(Vogelman, Lawrence)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Matthew Locke, Thomas J. Lyndon, Wentworth Douglass Hospital, Haden Wilber. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver(s) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1059-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1874426 filed by Robyn White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Notices and Waivers)(Vogelman, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Strafford County Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haden Wilber
Represented By: Emily Catherine Goering
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Matthew T. Broadhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Locke
Represented By: Emily Catherine Goering
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Matthew T. Broadhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wentworth Douglass Hospital
Represented By: Melissa M. Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Christine Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Lyndon
Represented By: Christopher M. Bracci
Represented By: John D. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn White
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?