USA v. $15,515.00 US. Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $15,515.00 U.S. Currency and $15,515.00 US Currency
Claimant: Evelyn Gomez and Christopher Hildreth
Case Number: 1:2019cv01078
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 11/28/2019. Claim due on 12/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Legal Notice)(Rabuck, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Evelyn Gomez (Keefe, Charles)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Evelyn Gomez. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Christopher Hildreth. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Christopher Hildreth, Evelyn Gomez Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Christopher Hildreth(pty:clm), Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Evelyn Gomez(pty:clm).(Keefe, Charles)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Christopher Hildreth , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Evelyn Gomez , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 US Marshal Service of Process re: Summons-Warrant in Rem/Warrant in Rem/Lis Pendens Issued served on 10/24/2019. (js)
October 21, 2019 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to $15,515.00 US Currency. (ej)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1078-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $15,515.00 US. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,515.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,515.00 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Evelyn Gomez
Represented By: Charles J. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher Hildreth
Represented By: Charles J. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?