New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Plaintiff: New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition d/b/a SchoolCare and New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2019cv01128
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London by New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/17/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Q. Shirley on behalf of New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition Attorney James Q. Shirley added to party New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition(pty:pla).(Shirley, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Paul Lirette on behalf of New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition Attorney Ryan Paul Lirette added to party New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition(pty:pla).(Lirette, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1128-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition d/b/a SchoolCare disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Harris, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1883358 filed by New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Harris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition d/b/a SchoolCare
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire School Health Care Coalition
Represented By: James P. Harris
Represented By: Ryan Paul Lirette
Represented By: James Q. Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?