Frazier v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Susan Frazier
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury, Monique Roberts, Jennifer Roberts, US Internal Revenue Service and US Department of Treasury
Case Number: 1:2019cv01148
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Replaces Doc. No. 8 filed by Susan Frazier. Follow up on Reply on 12/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A. Note May 30, 1997, #3 Exhibit B. Mtge May 30, 1997, #4 Exhibit C. Note April 1, 2004)(Barrington, Brian)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Objection to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Susan Frazier. Exhibits or Attachments added as one PDF document. Filer shall refile the main pleading and all exhibits in one entry as separate PDF documents and enter in the docket text: Replaces document no. 8. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.Compliance Deadline set for 12/5/2019.(jb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Re-filed see doc. no. #9 - OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Susan Frazier. Follow up on Reply on 12/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law With Exhibits A to C)(Barrington, Brian) Modified on 12/4/2019 to add re-filed text (jb).
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-CV-00551, Strafford County Superior Court County Superior Court(jb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graham Steadman on behalf of Monique Roberts (Steadman, Graham)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Monique Roberts.Follow up on Objection on 12/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Dutton, Steven)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Internal Revenue Service.(McCormack, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Jennifer Roberts ONLY with assent of remaining parties by Susan Frazier(Barrington, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add /// (jb).
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian R. Barrington on behalf of Susan Frazier (Barrington, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1148-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2019-CV-00551 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by U.S. Department of Treasury. Answer Follow Up on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Roberts
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Represented By: Graham Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Roberts
Represented By: Daniel J. Harkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Treasury
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Frazier
Represented By: Brian R. Barrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?