Lawsure v. Fulcrum Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Lawsure
Defendant: Fulcrum Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01156
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher H.M. Carter on behalf of Fulcrum Associates, Inc. (Carter, Christopher)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Complaint - New Case to January 27, 2020 filed by Fulcrum Associates, Inc.. Attorney Christopher H.M. Carter added to party Fulcrum Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).(Carter, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fulcrum Associates, Inc. by Daniel J. Lawsure. Served/Mailed on 11/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Fulcrum Associates, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1156-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1890989 filed by Daniel J. Lawsure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Summons - Waiver)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawsure v. Fulcrum Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulcrum Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H.M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Lawsure
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?