Burch v. The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire
Plaintiff: Diane C. Burch
Defendant: The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/6/2021 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2021 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 3/8/2021. JERS Statement due 3/8/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/22/2021. (js)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 7-10 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: The two week period beginning April 6, 2021. The parties shall file a joint report regarding the status of discovery on or before September 7, 2020. The pretrial conference scheduled for January 9, 2020 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/7/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 2/3/2020. Discovery deadline 11/6/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 6/15/2020.(js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Diane C. Burch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Format Request)(Burns, Heather)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2019-cv-01495, Rockingham County Superior Court(Closson, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Clerk's Notice - State Court Record has not been filed. State Court Record to be filed within 10 days of this notice. (js)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 1/2/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Closson, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 The Riverwoods Company at Exeter, NH's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire.(Closson, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1180-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2019-cv-01495 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1896068) filed by The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Closson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch v. The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane C. Burch
Represented By: Heather M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The RiverWoods Company at Exeter, New Hamphire
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?