B. v. Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation et al
Plaintiff: K. B.
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Best Western International, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01213
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 Addendum/ to #14 MOTION for Karen L. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1931920.) by Best Western International, Inc.. (Hartman, Kristin)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Carrier, Megan)
February 3, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #14 MOTION for Karen L. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1931920.) filed by Best Western International, Inc. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 14. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/7/2020.(ko)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by Best Western International, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hartman, Kristin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Karen L. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1931920.) filed by Best Western International, Inc.. Attorney Kristin Hartman added to party Best Western International, Inc. (pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Hartman, Kristin)
January 30, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error : Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. Marriott International, Inc. must file a Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Disclosure Statement due 2/6/2020. Compliance Deadline set for 2/6/2020.(kad)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted to the extent that the Answer deadline for Marriott International, Inc. is extended to February 18, 2020. The request to extend the deadline for plaintiff to respond to a motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice. A motion for an extension to time to object/respond may be filed after a motion to dismiss is filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Follow up on Objection on 2/18/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(kad)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party Marriott International, Inc. (pty:dft).(Lucic, Robert)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to Respond to Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carrier, Megan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan C. Carrier on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. Attorney Megan C. Carrier added to party Marriott International, Inc. (pty:dft).(Carrier, Megan)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Disclosure Statement has been filed by Best Western International, Inc. Best Western International, Inc. must file a Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Disclosure Statement due 2/4/2020. (bt)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lasna, Meredith)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted to the extent that the Answer deadline for Best Western is extended to February 10, 2020. The request to extend the deadline for plaintiff to respond to a motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice. A motion for an extension to time to object/respond may be filed after a motion to dismiss is filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(kad)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Complaint - New Case, #2 MOTION for Protective Order and leave to file anonymously to 2/10/2020 (Response to Protective Order due 14 days from filing Response to Complaint). Text of Order: Motion to extend time is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted to the extent that the Answer deadline for Wyndham is extended to February 10, 2020. The request to extend a deadline for plaintiff to respond to a motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice. A motion for an extension of time to object/respond may be filed after a motion to dismiss is filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(kad)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise plead to complaint filed by Best Western International, Inc..(Walton, Kenneth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. Attorney Kenneth B. Walton added to party Best Western International, Inc. (pty:dft).(Walton, Kenneth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Complaint - New Case, #2 MOTION for Protective Order and leave to file anonymously to 2/10/2020 (Response to Protective Order due 14 days from filing Response to Complaint) filed by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation. Attorney Meredith M. Lasna added to party Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation(pty:dft).(Lasna, Meredith)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the complaint sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (mc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer filed by K. B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rainboth, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #2 MOTION for Protective Order and leave to file anonymously. Text of Order: The court will take the motion for protective order (doc. no. 2) under advisement until such time as the defendant enters a notice of appearance and files a response to the motion. In the interim, the plaintiff is provisionally granted permission to proceed under a pseudonym. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #2 MOTION for Protective Order and leave to file anonymously filed by K. B. Pursuant to LR 7.1(a) Filers shall not combine multiple motions seeking separate and distinct relief into a single filing. Separate motions must be filed. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Best Western International, Inc., Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (mc)
December 9, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1213-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and leave to file anonymously filed by K.B..Follow up on Objection on 12/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit sex trafficking bulletin)(Rainboth, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1904327 filed by K.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hospitality Toolkit on Sex Trafficking, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Wyndham, #4 Summons Marriott, #5 Summons Best Western, #6 Summons Intercontinental)(Rainboth, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #7 Corrected Complaint with /s/) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. v. Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Meredith M. Lasna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Represented By: Kristin Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Carrier
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Michael P. Rainboth
Represented By: Leif A. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?