Douglas Company, Inc. v. My Brittany's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Company, Inc.
Defendant: Jacqueline Sultana and My Brittany's LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01234
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing re: #20 MOTION To Cancel or Defer Pre-trial Hearing . Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The court will contact counsel and provide the call-in information. (kad)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #20 Motion To Cancel or Defer Pre-trial Hearing. Text of Order: The pending motion to cancel or defer (doc. no. 20) does not appear to be assented to. Accordingly, the parties shall appear by telephone on February 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., they should be prepared to address the motion to cancel/defer. The pretrial conference will also be addressed on February 11, or rescheduled, depending on the outcome of the court's ruling on the pending motion. The clerk's office shall provide the parties with dial-in instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 OBJECTION to #20 MOTION To Cancel or Defer Pre-trial Hearing filed by Douglas Company, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 2/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Walker, Jeremy)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION To Cancel or Defer Pre-trial Hearing filed by My Brittany's LLC, Jacqueline Sultana.Follow up on Objection on 2/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hage, Jamie)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Rye on behalf of Douglas Company, Inc. Attorney Michael J Rye added to party Douglas Company, Inc.(pty:pla).(Rye, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #18 Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Unless the parties meet and confer and submit a joint discovery plan on or before February 7, 2020, the pretrial conference scheduled for February 11, 2020 will go forward as scheduled. The court notes that the plan submitted by plaintiff includes an incorrect trial date, Judge McAuliffe's February 2021 trial period is the two week period beginning February 17, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lw)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Michael J. Rye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michael J. Rye submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Discovery Plan (Plaintiff's Proposed Plan) filed by Douglas Company, Inc.. (Walker, Jeremy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 SURREPLY to Reply to #10 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by Douglas Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of William Mitchell, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Mitchell Exh. A Amazon Screen Shot, #3 Attachment to Exhibit Mitchell Exh. B Amazon Screen Shot, #4 Attachment to Exhibit Mitchell Exh. C City of Keene Letter, #5 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Dan Irvine, #6 Attachment to Exhibit Irvine Exh. A Order Confirmation)(Walker, Jeremy)
January 29, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #16 Reply to Objection to Motion, filed by Jacqueline Sultana, My Brittany's LLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. (lw)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by My Brittany's LLC, Jacqueline Sultana. Surreply due by 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Jacqueline Sultana in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A- Receipt for wholesaleplush domain, #3 Exhibit B- Cancel Order confirmation, #4 Exhibit C- Amazon FBA receipts)(Hage, Jamie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #10 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by Douglas Company, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 1/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of William Mitchell, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Adam Bercowetz, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - LARA Sultana Enterprises LLC, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - LARA My Brittany's LLC, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - WHOIS Search Results, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Wholesaleplush Homepage, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Kingdom Kuddles Instagram Page, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - My Brittany's Amazon webpage invoice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Invoice from Kingdom Kuddles, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Shipping Instructions, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - My Brittany's webpage, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Sales Info, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Bill of Lading for Shipments)(Walker, Jeremy)
January 17, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Reason for Reassignment: not all parties consent to the assignment of the case the the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 19-cv-1234-SM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Walker, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Michael J. Rye to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1925915.) filed by Douglas Company, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Rye, Esq.)(Walker, Jeremy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Elisabeth Hedges on behalf of My Brittany's LLC, Jacqueline Sultana Attorney Katherine Elisabeth Hedges added to party My Brittany's LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Elisabeth Hedges added to party Jacqueline Sultana(pty:dft).(Hedges, Katherine)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/4/2020. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by My Brittany's LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hage, Jamie)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) filed by My Brittany's LLC, Jacqueline Sultana. Attorney Jamie N. Hage added to party My Brittany's LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie N. Hage added to party Jacqueline Sultana(pty:dft). If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion.Follow up on Objection on 1/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Jaqueline Sultana in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hage, Jamie)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jacqueline Sultana by Douglas Company, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 1/3/2020. Answer Follow Up on 3/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Walker, Jeremy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to My Brittany's LLC by Douglas Company, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 1/3/2020. Answer Follow Up on 3/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Walker, Jeremy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (ed)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Douglas Company, Inc. submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $400, receipt no. ANHDC-1907151, re #1 Complaint - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper. (mc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses issued electronically as to My Brittany's LLC, Jacqueline Sultana. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ed)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Douglas Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Walker, Jeremy)
December 16, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint filed by Douglas Company, Inc., #3 Exhibits A-1 through E-3, filed by Douglas Company, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(mc)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1234-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit A-1 Photo of Smoky Grey Cat design to #1 Complaint - New Case by Douglas Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2 Cert. of Registration Smoky Grey Cat, #2 Exhibit A-3 Defs Photo Smoky Grey Cat, #3 Exhibit B-1 Photo of Floppy Husky, #4 Exhibit B-2 Cert. of Registration Floppy Husky, #5 Exhibit B-3 Defs Photo Floppy Husky, #6 Exhibit C-1 Photo Chase Border Collie, #7 Exhibit C-2 Cert. of Registration Chase Border Collie, #8 Exhibit C-3 Defs Photo Chase Border Collie, #9 Exhibit D-1 Photo Sinclair Australian Shepherd, #10 Exhibit D-2 Cert. of Registration Australian Shepherd, #11 Exhibit D-3 Defs Photo Australian Shepherd, #12 Exhibit E-1 Photo Kirby Tri-Color Corgi, #13 Exhibit E-2 Cert. of Registration Kirby Tri-Color Corgi, #14 Exhibit E-3 Defs Photo Kirby Tri-Color Corgi)(Walker, Jeremy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Action Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Douglas Company, Inc.(Walker, Jeremy) Modified on 12/16/2019 to remove the word Answer (mc).
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1907181 filed by Douglas Company, Inc.(Walker, Jeremy) Modified on 12/16/2019 to link doc. nos. 2, 3. (mc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #1 Summons My Brittany's LLC, #2 Summons Jacqueline Sultana) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Company, Inc. v. My Brittany's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy T. Walker
Represented By: Michael J Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Sultana
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Represented By: Jamie N. Hage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Brittany's LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Represented By: Jamie N. Hage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?