Polk v. Atrium Medical Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Polk
Defendant: Maquet Getinge Group, Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC and Getinge AB
Case Number: 1:2019cv02778
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
May 20, 2019 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-2778-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number: 2:19-cv-00690. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Hampshire. Electronic Transfer sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE of JURISDICTION of U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Atrium Medical Corporation. (Lee, Jae) (Docket Text Modified on 5/8/2019 by C. Schultz) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jimmy Polk. (Schultz, Steven) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Atrium Medical Corporation re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Lee, Jae) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Atrium Medical Corporation. (Lee, Jae) Modified on 4/26/2019 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00249538-CU-PL-GDS by Atrium Medical Corporation . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8224164) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Proof of Service)(Lee, Jae) [Transferred from caed on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Atrium Medical Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Polk
Represented By: Steven H. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Getinge Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Jae H. Lee
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getinge AB
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?