TheraBionic, Inc. v. Autem Medical, LLC
Plaintiff: TheraBionic, Inc.
Defendant: Autem Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Autem Medical, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 3/9/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Mesmer, Frank)
February 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/26/2020. (cmp)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Autem Medical, LLC. Attorney Frank B. Mesmer, Jr added to party Autem Medical, LLC(pty:dft).(Mesmer, Frank)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Autem Medical, LLC by TheraBionic, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 1/7/2020. Answer Follow Up on 1/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McLaughlin, Timothy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Autem Medical, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
January 6, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 20-cv-2-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by TheraBionic, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (McLaughlin, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNHDC-1915188 filed by TheraBionic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certain Autem Corporate Records, #2 Exhibit Presentation by Dr. Costa, #3 Exhibit 2003 NDA, #4 Exhibit 2007 NDA, #5 Exhibit 2012 NDA, #6 Exhibit Mechanism of Action, #7 Exhibit Tumour-specific Amplitude Modulated, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons - Waiver in a Civil Action). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(McLaughlin, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TheraBionic, Inc. v. Autem Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autem Medical, LLC
Represented By: Frank B. Mesmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TheraBionic, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy John McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?