Ingemi et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee
Plaintiff: Christine Ingemi and Richard Ingemi
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee for the Registered Holders of Saxon Asset Solutions Trust 2006-I, Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Notes, Series 2006-I and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee
Case Number: 1:2020cv00120
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/16/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 2/16/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/2/2021. (vln)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving in part #5 Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/16/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/8/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 11/16/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 9/15/2020.(vln)
March 10, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM is cancelled in light of the joint discovery plan. Order to issue. (vln)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #6 Notice (Other) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Other Documents / Consent/Objection - Magistrate Judge Assignment. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Notice of Assigment to US Magistrate Judge and Consent Form by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee.(Hardiman, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan Consented by the Parties filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Hardiman, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-00854, Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Failure to Complete Service, #4 State Court Notice of Removal)(Hardiman, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2020 Clerk's Notice - No STATE COURT RECORD Filed. LR 81.1(c) Certified Copy of State Court Record. The removing party shall file with the clerk's office a certified or attested copy of the state court record within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the notice of removal.State Court Record Due by 2/7/2020.(vln)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 3/4/2020. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee ANSWER to Complaint brought by Richard and Christine Ingemi for Plea of Title filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hardiman, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(ed)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-120-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Superior Court, case number 216-2019-CV-00854 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1924976) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee for the Registered Holders of Saxon Asset Solutions Trust 2006-I, Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Notes, Series 2006-I. Answer Follow Up on 2/5/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plea of Title Complaint, #2 Appendix Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Assessor's Valulation, #4 Exhibit D - Foreclosure Deed, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardiman, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2020: #6 TEXT SEARCHABLE Removal, #7 CORRECTED Civil Cover Sheet) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingemi et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ingemi
Represented By: Randall Baldwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ingemi
Represented By: Randall Baldwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee for the Registered Holders of Saxon Asset Solutions Trust 2006-I, Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Notes, Series 2006-I
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?