Barden v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Barden
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00149
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Patricia Barden re #6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Patricia Barden. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or.(Grant, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Patricia Barden re #6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Patricia Barden. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or.(Grant, Christopher)
March 17, 2020 Clerk's Notice - No CONSENT FORM Filed. The parties are directed to file a CONSENT FORM within 7 days. See docket entry no. #2 for instruction. (vln)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to and Agreed Upon Joint Request for a Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. The clerk's office shall provide the parties with call-in instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION Assented to and Agreed Upon Joint Request for a Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Patricia Barden.(Grant, Christopher)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #6 Discovery Plan. Text of Order: The preliminary pretrial conference in this case will go forward as scheduled. The parties may jointly request to have the conference conducted by telephone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Patricia Barden. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Grant, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 3/18/2020. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Walmart Stores, Inc..(Sutton, Blake)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Walmart Stores, Inc. Affidavit of Service filed by Patricia Barden. Served/Mailed on 2/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 2/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Grant, Christopher)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Walmart Stores, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
January 22, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-149-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1927643 filed by Patricia Barden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Grant, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barden v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Barden
Represented By: Christopher E. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?