Kelley et al v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: The Karyn M. Kelley Revocable Trust and Karyn M. Kelley
Defendant: Charles A. Russell, Merrimack Police Department and Daniel C. Proctor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00162
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Represent the Trust Pro Se filed by Karyn M. Kelley.(js)
February 5, 2020 Set Deadline: Compliance of #4 Order. Plaintiff, Ms. Kelley, shall (1) File a motion to represent the trust pro se and attach documentation sufficient to establish that she is the sole beneficiary of the trust; or(2)Retain counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on behalf of the trust. Compliance Deadline set for 2/26/2020. (ed)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
January 30, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-162-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by The Karyn M. Kelley Revocable Trust.(ed)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Karyn M. Kelley. (ed)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrimack Police Department, Daniel C. Proctor, Charles A. Russell with Jury Demand filed by Karyn M. Kelley, The Karyn M. Kelley Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Karyn M. Kelley Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn M. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrimack Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?