Mogaji v. Chan et al
Plaintiff: Martha I.O Mogaji
Defendant: Nan King Restaurant, Tom Chan, TRC Trust and Rosa Chan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00249
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:19-cv-12585. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE. A copy of this Order has been mailed along with a copy of the Docket Sheet to Martha I.O. Mogaji. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF TRANSFER. The clerk directed to transfer this action to the United StatesDistrict Court for the District of New Hampshire pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Whether Mogaji should be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Martha I.O. Mogaji. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nan King Restaurant, Tom Chan, Rosa Chan, TRC Trust, filed by Marth l.O Mogaji.(Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, ) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marth l.O Mogaji.(Castilla, Francis) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marth l.O Mogaji. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) [Transferred from mad on 2/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mogaji v. Chan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha I.O Mogaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nan King Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?