Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc. v. GrubHub, Inc.
Plaintiff: Great New Hampshire Restaurants Inc. and Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc.
Defendant: GrubHub Inc. and GrubHub, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00284
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (ed)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Parker, Robert)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 4, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 3/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to GrubHub, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
February 24, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-284-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Great New Hampshire Restaurants Inc.(Parker, Robert)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1943441 filed by Great New Hampshire Restaurants Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc. v. GrubHub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrubHub Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrubHub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great New Hampshire Restaurants Inc.
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great New Hampshire Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?