Kalloch v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Plaintiff: James R. Kalloch and Acting Commissioner Social Security Administratrion
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Not Classified By Court: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00294
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David F. Chermol on behalf of James R. Kalloch Attorney David F. Chermol added to party James R. Kalloch(pty:pla).(Chermol, David)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for David Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for David Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1947943.) filed by James R. Kalloch.Follow up on Objection on 3/19/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chermol, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Grauel, Douglas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. ATTENTION: Pursuant to Local Rule 9.1(a)(1), the government agrees not to contest the adequacy of service when the summonses and complaint are transmitted through the court's Electronic Filing System. SSA Record Due 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice in SSA Cases) (ed)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
February 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-294-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by James R. Kalloch. Follow up on Objection on 3/13/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order IFP)(Grauel, Douglas) Modified on 3/2/2020 to add: Corrected from "in forma pauperis on Appeal with Financial Affidavit" to "Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs" (ed).
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by James R. Kalloch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2Proposed Summons OGC, #3Proposed Summons USAG, #4Proposed Summons USAO)(Grauel, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalloch v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Kalloch
Represented By: Douglas Allen Grauel
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acting Commissioner Social Security Administratrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?