USA v. Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Claremont, NH, 10 Grove St and Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon
Case Number: 1:2020cv00303
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to for Filing Verfified Claim by Sixty (60) Days for Defendant, Maria Aponte. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to for Filing Verfified Claim by Sixty (60) Days for Defendant, Maria Aponte filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Rancourt, Jaye)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Appearance on behalf of Maria Aponte by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Jaye Rancourt added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Rancourt, Jaye)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Verified Claim by 60 Days. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Verified Claim by 60 Days filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Graham-FPD, Dorothy)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorothy E. Graham-FPD on behalf of Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Dorothy E. Graham-FPD added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Graham-FPD, Dorothy)
March 5, 2020 WRIT of Entry Issued as to Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(mc)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-303-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Writ of Entry)(Rabuck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claremont, NH, 10 Grove St
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon
Represented By: Dorothy E. Graham-FPD
Represented By: Jaye Rancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?