Theodore et al v. The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association
Plaintiff: Dino N. Theodore and Access with Success, Inc.
Defendant: The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv00307
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/7/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case filed by The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association.(McGown, Christopher)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association by Dino N. Theodore, Access with Success, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 3/13/2020. Answer Follow Up on 4/3/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Guerrera, Nicholas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-307-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Access with Success, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Guerrera, Nicholas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1947446 filed by Access with Success, Inc., Dino N. Theodore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Guerrera, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theodore et al v. The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino N. Theodore
Represented By: Nicholas S. Guerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access with Success, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas S. Guerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northbridge Business Center Condominium Association
Represented By: Christopher Pierce McGown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?