Province Lake Golf Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: PROVINCE LAKE GOLF ENTERPRISES, INC. and PLG HOLDING LLC
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00309
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.Follow up on Objection on 4/17/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Horton, Dana)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Marie Horton on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Attorney Dana Marie Horton added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Horton, Dana)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Province Lake Golf Enterprises, Inc., PLG Holding LLC.(Rakhunov, Phillip)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by PLG Holding LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rakhunov, Phillip)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Province Lake Golf Enterprises, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rakhunov, Phillip)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-309-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1947505 filed by Province Lake Golf Enterprises, Inc., PLG Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Rakhunov, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #2 Summons) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Province Lake Golf Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVINCE LAKE GOLF ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Phillip Rakhunov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLG HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Phillip Rakhunov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana Marie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?