Grant Heilman Photography, Inc. v. Arkival Technology Corporation
Plaintiff: Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Arkival Technology Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00332
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon R. Brown on behalf of Arkival Technology Corporation Attorney Simon R. Brown added to party Arkival Technology Corporation(pty:dft).(Brown, Simon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #9 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password. Text of Order: denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER mooting #8 Pro Se MOTION. Text of Order: Moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Arkival Technology Corporation. Counsel to file an appearance within twenty-one days of the date of this order. The deadline for counsel to respond/answer the complaint is extended to June 12, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to June 12, 2020 filed by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 4/30/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix 1)(Burt, Gary)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Arkival Technology Corporation (Ronald D. Weiss).(kad)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION filed by Arkival Technology Corporation (Ronald D. Weiss, President). Follow up on Objection on 5/4/2020. (kad)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Arkival Technology Corporation filed by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/6/2020. Answer Follow Up on 4/27/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Burt, Gary)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Joshua Graubart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Joshua Graubart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1956148.) filed by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 4/9/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Certification in Support of Motion to Admit Pro have Vice)(Burt, Gary)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burt, Gary)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (ed)
March 24, 2020 SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. NO DISCLOSURE STATEMENT HAS BEEN FILED. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Grant Heilman Photography, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by 3/31/2020. Disclosure Statement due 3/31/2020. (kad)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Grant Heilman Photography, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 23, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 3/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Arkival Technology Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ed)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
March 12, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-332-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1951397 filed by Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SOS Online Database Entry for Arkival, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arkival Website, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Burt, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant Heilman Photography, Inc. v. Arkival Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkival Technology Corporation
Represented By: Simon R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Heilman Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?