Garcia Alvarez v. US Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Garcia Alvarez and Emerson Garcia Alvarez
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Respondent: Christopher Brackett
Case Number: 1:2020cv00334
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry L. Ollila on behalf of US Department of Homeland Security Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:res).(Ollila, Terry)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Emerson Garcia Alvarez (Abramson, Ronald)
April 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/3/2020. Status report to be filed in 30 days. (Pltfs Atty: Ronald Abramson) (Defts Atty: Terry Ollila)(Total Hearing Time: 15 minutes)(CJA Time: 15 minutes) (js)
April 1, 2020 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2020 11:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The court has provided the parties with dial-in information.(js)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Certified mail receipt for Ice Boston Field Office. (js)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 US Marshal Service of Process re: #10 Order served on 3/20/2020, on Christopher Brackett, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent.(js)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The court will contact the parties with dial-in information.(js)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE of Attorney Appointment- Attorney Ronald L. Abramson appointed in the case as to Emerson Garcia Alvarez.(js)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The clerk's office is directed to appoint counsel for the petitioner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B) of the Criminal Justice Act. Once appointed, counsel shall have 14 days to review the case and a status conference will be scheduled accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- Status Conference scheduled for 3/16/2020 is CANCELLED per Standing Order 20-4 issued March 15, 2020. The court will reschedule the hearing. (js)
March 16, 2020 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via interoffice mail to US Attorney's Office; via certified mail, return receipt requested to ICE Boston Field Office; Copies to US Marshal as to Christopher Bracket Superintendent Strafford County Department of Corrections; and copies via US Mail to Emerson Garcia Alvarez, per #10 Order.(js)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 05:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-334-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (ed)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (ed)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:20-cv-10474. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred to to District of New Hampshire;. Original file with documents numbered 1-6,and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Weyland, Loren) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST079157 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Emerson Garcia Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form I-797C, Notice of Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Weyland, Loren) (Weyland, Loren). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia Alvarez v. US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garcia Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Garcia Alvarez
Represented By: Ronald L. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?