Doe 1-10 v. US Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Doe 1-10 and John Doe 1-10
Defendant: US Bank N.A, US Bank N.A., US BANCORP and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Case Number: 1:2020cv00335
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike the Appearance of "Primmer, Piper, Eggleston, Cramer PC" for Defendant Wilmington Savings Fun Society and to Quash #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by John Doe 1-10. Follow up on Objection on 5/20/2020. (lw)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to US Bank N.A. Served/Mailed on 4/8/2020. Answer Follow Up on 4/29/2020. (lw)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Replaces document no. 4 filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.Follow up on Objection on 5/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B - Assignments, #4 Exhibit C - Wilmington Proof of Claim, #5 Exhibit D -February 26, 2020 Order, #6 Exhibit E - April 25, 2017 Order, #7 Exhibit F- November 9, 2018 Order, #8 Exhibit G -May 23, 2019 Order, #9 Exhibit H - May 3, 2019 Order, #10 Exhibit I - June 27, 2019 State Court Order, #11 Exhibit J - Quitclaim Deed, #12 Exhibit K - Wilmington Motion for Relief)(Pappas, Thomas) Modified on 4/28/2020 to add: replaces doc. no. 4 text (lw).
April 27, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Answer to Complaint, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile using the Motion - Dismiss event and enter in docket text: Replaces document no. 4. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 5/4/2020.(lw)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Pappas, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPLACED - See doc. no. 6. ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismis, #2 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B - Assignments, #4 Exhibit C - Wilmington Proof of Claim, #5 Exhibit D - February 26, 2020 Order, #6 Exhibit E - April 25, 2017 Order, #7 Exhibit F - November 9, 2018 Order, #8 Exhibit G - May 23, 2019 Order, #9 Exhibit H - May 3, 2019 Complaint, #10 Exhibit I - June 27, 2019 State Court Order, #11 Exhibit J - Quitclaim Deed, #12 Exhibit K - Wilmington Motion for Relief)(Pappas, Thomas) Modified on 4/28/2020 to add: replaced text(lw).
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB by John Doe 1-10. Served/Mailed on 4/6/2020. Answer Follow Up on 4/27/2020. (lw)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to US Bank N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-335-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Bank N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Filing fee $400 receipt number 14649019071) filed by John Doe 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1-10 v. US Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANCORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Thomas J. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?