Simone, Jr. v. Monaco et al
Plaintiff: Simone, Jr. and Richard Simone, Jr.
Defendant: Monaco, Jonathan Bourget, Clark Gephardt, Joshua Trefry, Joseph Flynn, David Armstrong, Jonathan Santimore, James Tollner, Robert L. Quinn, Steven Hallam, Thomas Lencki, Jr., Richard McKeon, Andrew Monaco, Jarrod Woeller and Mark Suttmeier
Case Number: 1:2020cv00336
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 96 Summons issued electronically as to Robert L. Quinn. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
May 7, 2020 Filing 95 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Richard Simone, Jr.(Fallon, Timothy)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #91 Motion for Douglas I. Louison to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #92 Motion for Matthew T. Goepfrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (lw)
April 21, 2020 Filing 94 Summonses issued electronically as to Thomas Lencki, Jr., Mark Suttmeier. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(lw)
April 21, 2020 Filing 93 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Richard Simone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver Summons - Lencki)(Fallon, Timothy)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #86 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defs. Lencki and Suttmeier. Text of Order: Granted. As not all parties have been served in the case, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The court will schedule the pretrial conference once all defendants have been served or upon the expiration of time allowed for service on remaining defendants under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Case Follow-up Deadline set for 6/19/2020.(lw)
April 16, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Matthew T. Goepfrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1964704.) filed by David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore.Follow up on Objection on 4/30/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Scully, Liam)
April 16, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Douglas I. Louison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1964687.) filed by David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore.Follow up on Objection on 4/30/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Scully, Liam)
April 16, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Liam D. Scully on behalf of David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore Attorney Liam D. Scully added to party David Armstrong(pty:dft), Attorney Liam D. Scully added to party Jonathan Bourget(pty:dft), Attorney Liam D. Scully added to party Jonathan Santimore(pty:dft).(Scully, Liam)
April 8, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daryl Abbas on behalf of Richard Simone, Jr. Attorney Daryl Abbas added to party Richard Simone, Jr.(pty:pla).(Abbas, Daryl)
April 6, 2020 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Andrew Monaco.(Burrows, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry.(Cullen, Brian)
April 1, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defs. Lencki and Suttmeier filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Fallon, Timothy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION to Amend filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit), #3 Exhibit, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Summons - Col. Mason (MSPD), #6 Summons - John Doe (NHSPD))(Fallon, Timothy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Vacate 54 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Exhibit A - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Fallon, Timothy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy F. Fallon on behalf of Richard Simone, Jr. (Fallon, Timothy)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #76 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint; granting #77 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 4/6/2020. (lw)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Timothy F. Fallon submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Daryl Abbas submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Joseph F. Comenzo submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
March 23, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Thomas Lencki, Jr., Robert L. Quinn, Mark Suttmeier. Affidavit of Service due on 4/6/2020.(lw)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Douglas I. Louison, Esq., Matthew T. Goepfrich, Esq., Joseph P. Kittredge, Esq., and Lorena Galvez, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/22/2020. (ed)
March 23, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 23, 2020 Filing 81 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/22/2020. (ed)
March 21, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Timothy F. Fallon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1954248.) filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Kalil, Philip)
March 21, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Daryl Abbas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1954247.) filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Kalil, Philip)
March 21, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Joseph F. Comenzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1954246.) filed by Richard Simone, Jr..Follow up on Objection on 4/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Kalil, Philip)
March 18, 2020 Filing 77 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2020 filed by Andrew Monaco.(Burrows, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 76 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2020 filed by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry.(Cullen, Brian)
March 18, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip M. Kalil on behalf of Richard Simone, Jr. Attorney Philip M. Kalil added to party Richard Simone, Jr.(pty:pla).(Kalil, Philip)
March 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-336-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 13, 2020 Filing 74 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 4:19-cv-11070. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 73, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
March 13, 2020 Filing 73 Case transferred to the District of New Hampshire. Original file with documents numbered 1-73, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 72 Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , #65 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03-06-2020 to File Response/Reply as to #64 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction < filed by Joseph Flynn. (Galvez, Lorena) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 71 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #63 Motion to Vacate. The Court vacates its dismissal orders (Docket Nos. 47, 48) and, pursuant to 1631 and 1406(a),3 orders that the case be transferred to the District of New Hampshire. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore. (Goepfrich, Matthew)[Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 69 Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry. (Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Monaco. (Burrows, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 67 Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Monaco. (Burrows, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 66 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 3/6/2020. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 65 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03-06-2020 to File Response/Reply as to #64 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Joseph Flynn.(Galvez, Lorena) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard Simone, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aff. of Attorney Comenzo)(Fallon, Timothy) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Vacate #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Richard Simone, Jr..(Fallon, Timothy) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 62 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2020. Fact Discovery to be completed by 10/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021.(Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Jarrod Woeller only by Richard Simone, Jr.. (Fallon, Timothy) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 60 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Scheduling Conference held on 2/10/2020, Case called, Counsel appear for scheduling conference, Court adopts parties proposed scheduling order deadlines, Scheduling order to issue, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Fallon/Goepfrich/Kittredge/Cloherty) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy F. Fallon on behalf of Richard Simone, Jr. (Fallon, Timothy) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 57 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 31, 2019, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 2/28/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 56 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore.(Goepfrich, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/10/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. See original notice of scheduling conference dated 7/16/19 ECF #8 .(Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 54 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Motion to Dismiss. No opposition having been filed and for the reasons stated in the memorandum in support. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard McKeon. (Eldredge, Nicole) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 52 First MOTION to Dismiss by Richard McKeon.(Eldredge, Nicole) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole A. Eldredge on behalf of Richard McKeon (Eldredge, Nicole) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jarrod Woeller.(Cloherty, John) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 49 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss and finding as moot #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 48 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting #31 Motion to Dismiss. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 47 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 46 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2019 re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Andrew Monaco, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Failure to Timely Serve filed by Andrew Monaco, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry, and #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Monaco, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court rules granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jarrod Woeller answer due 11/18/2019, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #24 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and taking under advisement #31 Motion to Dismiss. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Comenzo/Burrows,Bauer/Cullen/Cloherty/Goepfrich) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Jarrod Woeller.(Cloherty, John) Modified on 10/29/2019 (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of Jarrod Woeller (Cloherty, John) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Flynn.(Kittredge, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorena Galvez on behalf of Joseph Flynn (Galvez, Lorena) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Defendant Flynn. (Kittredge, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Kittredge on behalf of Joseph Flynn (Kittredge, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Dona Feeney (Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew V. Burrows on behalf of Andrew Monaco (Burrows, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Refiled), #31 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (refiled), #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Failure to Timely Serve : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Goepfrich on behalf of David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore (Goepfrich, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Monaco served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Comenzo, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Armstrong served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Jonathan Bourget served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Jonathan Santimore served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Jarrod Woeller served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Comenzo, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (refiled) (refiled) filed by Andrew Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Monaco)(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (refiled) by Andrew Monaco.(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Refiled) (Refiled) filed by Andrew Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Monaco)(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Refiled) by Andrew Monaco.(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 28 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles P. Bauer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 DISREGARD - SEE DOCKET #30 - MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Monaco)(Feeney, Dona) Modified on 9/16/2019 (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 DISRGARD - SEE DOCKET #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Andrew Monaco.(Feeney, Dona) Modified on 9/16/2019 (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Failure to Timely Serve filed by Andrew Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Monaco)(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Failure to Timely Serve by Andrew Monaco.(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles P. Bauer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7870556 by Andrew Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certification Affidavit of Charles P. Bauer)(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Andrew Monaco (Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry. (Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion was filed twice. (See document #15 ) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. the Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 is hereby canceled, the Court will be setting a hearing on all the pending motions. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard Simone, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Comenzo, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gaphardt, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Hallam, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Trefry)(Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry.(Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Gaphardt, #3 Declaration of Hallam, #4 Declaration of Trefry)(Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 26, 2019 to Perfect Service on All Defendants by Richard Simone, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Comenzo, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion to Continue. Counsel filed pleading as a Notice without a Rule 7.1 certification. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry re #8 Notice of Scheduling Conference (Cullen, Brian) Modified on 8/1/2019 (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Louison, Douglas) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Louison, Douglas) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/16/2019) (Castles, Martin). [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J.S. Cullen on behalf of Clark Gephardt, Steven Hallam, James Tollner, Joshua Trefry (Cullen, Brian) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore.(Louison, Douglas) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas I. Louison on behalf of David Armstrong, Jonathan Bourget, Jonathan Santimore (Louison, Douglas) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 5/9/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-11070. (Alba, Robert) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7676143 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Richard Simone, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Comenzo, Joseph) [Transferred from mad on 3/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simone, Jr. v. Monaco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bourget
Represented By: Matthew T. Goepfrich
Represented By: Douglas I. Louison
Represented By: Liam D. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Gephardt
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Trefry
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Flynn
Represented By: Lorena Galvez
Represented By: Joseph P. Kittredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Armstrong
Represented By: Matthew T. Goepfrich
Represented By: Douglas I. Louison
Represented By: Liam D. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Santimore
Represented By: Matthew T. Goepfrich
Represented By: Douglas I. Louison
Represented By: Liam D. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tollner
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hallam
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lencki, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McKeon
Represented By: Nicole A. Eldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Monaco
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Woeller
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Suttmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Simone, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy F. Fallon
Represented By: Joseph F. Comenzo
Represented By: Daryl Abbas
Represented By: Philip M. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?