Therrien v. Airmar Technology Corp
Plaintiff: Sherrie Therrien
Defendant: Airmar Technology Corp
Case Number: 1:2020cv00422
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 7/7/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 6/7/2021. JERS Statement due 6/7/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 6/22/2021.(js)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: Two week period beginning July 7, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan (Jointly Proposed) filed by Airmar Technology Corp. (Closson, Thomas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2020-cv-129, Hillsborough County, Southern District County Superior Court(Closson, Thomas)
April 22, 2020 Clerk's Notice - No State Court Record Filed. The state court record shall be filed within 14 days of this notice. (js)
April 13, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 5/18/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/11/2020. The court will supply the parties with dial-in information. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Airmar Technology Corp.(Closson, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Airmar Technology Corp disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Closson, Thomas)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Airmar Technology Corp. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Airmar Technology Corp shall file a disclosure statement by April 14, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 4/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
April 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-422-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court Southern District, case number 226-2020-cv-00129 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1960685) filed by Airmar Technology Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 4/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Closson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Therrien v. Airmar Technology Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Therrien
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airmar Technology Corp
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?