Calabrese et al v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Calabrese Grace, Matthew Calabrese and Grace Calabrese
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC and Atrium Medical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00427
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 4/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 6/26/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Power, Caroline)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Attorney Caroline NJ. Power added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline NJ. Power added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 4/23/2020. Answer Follow Up on 6/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Power, Caroline)
April 9, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 7, 2020 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-427-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1960892 filed by Calabrese Grace, Matthew Calabrese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alonso, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calabrese et al v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Represented By: Caroline NJ. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Represented By: Caroline NJ. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calabrese Grace
Represented By: Andres F. Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Calabrese
Represented By: Andres F. Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Calabrese
Represented By: Andres F. Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?