Brown v. Littleton Hospital Association
Plaintiff: Morgan Brown
Defendant: Littleton Hospital Association, LLC d/b/a Littleton Regional Healthcare and Littleton Hospital Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv00455
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Video. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/15/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Littleton Hospital Association.(Carrier, Megan)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Littleton Hospital Association by Morgan Brown. Served/Mailed on 4/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 6/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Townsend, Allan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Littleton Hospital Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-455-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1964355 filed by Morgan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Waiver)(Townsend, Allan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Littleton Hospital Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littleton Hospital Association, LLC d/b/a Littleton Regional Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littleton Hospital Association
Represented By: Megan C. Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Brown
Represented By: Allan Keith Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?