Clancey v. NICE Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Clancey
Defendant: NICE Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00640
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 8/3/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 7/1/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 7/15/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/5/2021.(vln)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by NICE Systems, Inc.. (Scott, K.)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Discovery Plan DUE BY 7/10/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by NICE Systems, Inc..(Scott, K.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by NICE Systems, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Scott, K.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2020-cv-544, Rockingham County Superior Court(Scott, K.)
May 29, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,filed by NICE Systems, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. NICE Systems, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by June 5, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 6/5/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
May 29, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ed)
May 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-640-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2020-cv-544 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1984450) filed by NICE Systems, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 6/18/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clancey v. NICE Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Clancey
Represented By: Sean Robert List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICE Systems, Inc.
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?