USA v. Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln and Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr
Case Number: 1:2020cv00721
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Notice of ASSENT by Colleen Savage, Esq., counsel for the claimant, George Kuiper as to #15 MOTION to Temporarily Lift Stay to Grant Motion for Writs of Entry .(Rabuck, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Writs of Entry filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry - 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #2 Writ of Entry - 1576 Creek Bend Ln., #3 Writ of Entry - 2775 Old Shackleford Rd.)(Rabuck, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Temporarily Lift Stay to Grant Motion for Writs of Entry filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/31/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: The request for a stay is granted. A joint status report shall be filed every 90 days. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Status Report due by 11/12/2020. (gla)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 CLAIM for Verified Claim of George Kuiper by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. Answer Follow Up on 9/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Savage, Colleen)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Forfeiture Proceeding filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr.(Savage, Colleen)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to August 17, 2020 to respond to Show Cause Order regarding writs of entry. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
August 11, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. THIS IS AN APPEARANCE OF ANTHONY SGRO AND NOT COLLEEN SAVAGE. ATTORNEY SGRO MUST FOLLOW THE INSTRUCTIONS IN THE ORDER GRANTING PHV ADMISSION AND REFILE AN APPEARANCE UNDER HIS NAME. If the filer has questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1623.(de)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time to August 17, 2020 to respond to Show Cause Order regarding writs of entry, DN 8, filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Attorneys Sgro and Savage, counsel for George Kuiper , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 7/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 8/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colleen N. Savage on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr (Savage, Colleen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colleen N. Savage on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr Attorney Colleen N. Savage added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen N. Savage added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen N. Savage added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr(pty:dft).(Savage, Colleen)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Anthony P. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Colleen N. Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Both motions (documents 4 and 5) are granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorneys with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorneys must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorneys must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. For the reasons discussed within, plaintiff the United States of America is ordered to show cause why the court should not deny its request for writs of entry. Plaintiff shall file its response to this order by not later than August 10, 2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Colleen N Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999313.) Corrected filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr(Phillips, Roger)
July 7, 2020 Notice of ASSENT by Robert Rabuck, Esquire as to #5 MOTION for Colleen N Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999313.), #4 MOTION for Anthony P. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999308.).(Phillips, Roger)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger B. Phillips on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001(pty:dft), Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr(pty:dft).(Phillips, Roger)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Colleen N Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999313.) filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln.Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Colleen N. Savage)(Phillips, Roger)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Anthony P. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999308.) filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln.Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony P. Sgro)(Phillips, Roger)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger B. Phillips on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln(pty:dft).(Phillips, Roger)
June 29, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 1:20-cv-721-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (mc)
June 26, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
June 24, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-721-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #4 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste. 1001, #5 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 1576 Creek Bend Ln.)(Rabuck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001
Represented By: Roger B. Phillips
Represented By: Colleen N. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln
Represented By: Roger B. Phillips
Represented By: Colleen N. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr
Represented By: Roger B. Phillips
Represented By: Colleen N. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?