Harrington et al v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Harrington and Shawna Harrington
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00752
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura M. Gregory on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company Attorney Laura M. Gregory added to party Amica Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Gregory, Laura)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2020-cv-00448, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Antonellis, Anthony)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Counterclaim with jury demand re #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Defendants-in-Counterclaim Answer to Amica's Counterclaim for DJ by Brian Harrington, Shawna Harrington.(McDowell, Joseph)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to August 22, 2020. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 8/24/2020. (jb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Laura Meyer Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Emily Kaminska to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to August 22, 2020 filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Antonellis, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Emily Kaminska to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2004855.) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Emily Kaminska)(Antonellis, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Laura Meyer Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2004849.) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Laura Meyer Gregory)(Antonellis, Anthony)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with jury demand filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Noelle Harrington Ellis Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Noelle Harrington Ellis Statement)(Antonellis, Anthony)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Antonellis, Anthony)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court, ND, case number 216-2020-CV-00448 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2000371 filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 7/29/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Documents)(Antonellis, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court) (ed).
July 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-752-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Amica Mutual Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by July 15, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 7/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington et al v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Harrington
Represented By: Joseph F. McDowell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Harrington
Represented By: Joseph F. McDowell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony J. Antonellis
Represented By: Laura M. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?