USA v. Canik TP-9SF pistol, serial number 15AT32088 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ruger LCP pistol, serial number 372112525, Canik TP-9SF pistol, serial number 15AT32088, Zastava PAP M92 PV pistol, serial number M92PV071191, Glock Inc. 42 pistol, serial number ACSS820, Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0010-38090, LRB Arms M15SA rifle, serial number 035161, Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0003-35338 and Mossberg 500A shotgun, serial number 42965B
Case Number: 1:2020cv00772
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem WARRANT Returned Executed on Defendant in Rem Firearms on 9/2/20.(Rabuck, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Krystara Valley , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 8/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 9/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to Canik TP-9SF pistol, serial number 15AT32088, Glock Inc. 42 pistol, serial number ACSS820, LRB Arms M15SA rifle, serial number 035161, Mossberg 500A shotgun, serial number 42965B, Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0003-35338, Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0010-38090, Ruger LCP pistol, serial number 372112525, Zastava PAP M92 PV pistol, serial number M92PV071191. (ed)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-772-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Defendants in rem, #3 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Canik TP-9SF pistol, serial number 15AT32088 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger LCP pistol, serial number 372112525
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canik TP-9SF pistol, serial number 15AT32088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zastava PAP M92 PV pistol, serial number M92PV071191
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock Inc. 42 pistol, serial number ACSS820
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0010-38090
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRB Arms M15SA rifle, serial number 035161
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 10/22 rifle, serial number 0003-35338
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossberg 500A shotgun, serial number 42965B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?