Veinotte v. Milford DCH, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Veinotte
Defendant: Milford DCH, Inc. doing business as DCH Toyota of Milford
Case Number: 1:2020cv00777
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/29/2020 filed by Milford DCH, Inc.. Attorney Gregory Scott Paonessa added to party Milford DCH, Inc.(pty:dft).(Paonessa, Gregory)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Milford DCH, Inc. by Adam Veinotte. Served/Mailed on 8/17/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Milford DCH, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-777-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2004258 filed by Adam Veinotte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sherman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veinotte v. Milford DCH, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Veinotte
Represented By: John P. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford DCH, Inc. doing business as DCH Toyota of Milford
Represented By: Gregory Scott Paonessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?