Dominic v. Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association et al
Plaintiff: Steven Dominic
Defendant: John DeWispelaere, Gerald H. Little, Jonathan J. Winters, Franklins Saving Bank Directors 11-111, Bank of New Hampshire Directors Doe Parties 112-211, Bean Group Title & Escrow LLC, Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association, Bianco Law Firm PLLC, Emelia A.S. Galdiera, Patricia Kingwill, Kerin Ferrin, Ronald M. Magoon, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Michael Bean, Dean Chase, Provident Bank Directors Doe 1-10, Stephen R. Goldman, Charles W. Chandler, James J. Bianco, Jr. and Emelia A.S. Galdieri
Case Number: 1:2020cv00854
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael Bean by Michael Bean. Served/Mailed on 10/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 12/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quirk, Brian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association by Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association. Attorney Simon R. Brown added to party Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Brown, Simon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stephen R. Goldman by Stephen R. Goldman. Attorney Simon R. Brown added to party Stephen R. Goldman(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Brown, Simon)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Michael Zoracki on behalf of John DeWispelaere, Gerald H. Little, Emelia A.S. Galdieri Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party John DeWispelaere(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party Gerald H. Little(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party Emelia A.S. Galdieri(pty:dft).(Zoracki, Seth)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bean Group Title & Escrow LLC, John DeWispelaere, Emelia A.S. Galdiera, Gerald H. Little by Steven Dominic. Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Patricia Kingwill by Patricia Kingwill. Attorney Matthew Vernon Burrows added to party Patricia Kingwill(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Burrows, Matthew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bianco Law Firm PLLC by Bianco Law Firm PLLC. Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Bianco Law Firm PLLC(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smith, Linda)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law by Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law. Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smith, Linda)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James J. Bianco, Jr by James J. Bianco, Jr. Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party James J. Bianco, Jr(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smith, Linda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Dominic re: #1 Complaint. (js)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Michael Bean, Bean Group Title & Escrow LLC, James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Law Firm PLLC, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Charles W. Chandler, Dean Chase, John DeWispelaere, Kerin Ferrin, Emelia A.S. Galdiera, Stephen R. Goldman, Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association, Patricia Kingwill, Gerald H. Little, Ronald M. Magoon, Jonathan J. Winters. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-854-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of New Hampshire Directors Doe Parties 112-211, Michael Bean, Bean Group Title & Escrow LLC, James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Law Firm PLLC, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Charles W. Chandler, Dean Chase, John DeWispelaere, Kerin Ferrin, Franklins Saving Bank Directors 11-111, Emelia A.S. Galdiera, Stephen R. Goldman, Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association, Patricia Kingwill, Gerald H. Little, Ronald M. Magoon, Provident Bank Directors Doe 1-10, Jonathan J. Winters with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 14649019601) filed by Steven Dominic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-25, #2 Exhibits 26-50, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Summonses) (ed) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #5 Civil Cover Sheet and Defendant List, #6 Plaintiff's Pro Se Appearance, #7 Cover Letter) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominic v. Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DeWispelaere
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald H. Little
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan J. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklins Saving Bank Directors 11-111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New Hampshire Directors Doe Parties 112-211
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bean Group Title & Escrow LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman & LeBrun Professional Association
Represented By: Simon R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianco Law Firm PLLC
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emelia A.S. Galdiera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kingwill
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerin Ferrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. Magoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Bank Directors Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Goldman
Represented By: Simon R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Bianco, Jr.
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emelia A.S. Galdieri
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dominic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?