Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Rathe et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Anne R. Rathe and Elaine M. Ferrier
Case Number: 1:2020cv00858
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elaine M. Ferrier by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 8/14/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/16/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H. Darling on behalf of Anne R. Rathe Attorney Michael H. Darling added to party Anne R. Rathe(pty:dft).(Darling, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case,, in Interpleader filed by Anne R. Rathe.(Pettis, Philip)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip L. Pettis on behalf of Anne R. Rathe Attorney Philip L. Pettis added to party Anne R. Rathe(pty:dft).(Pettis, Philip)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anne R. Rathe by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 8/14/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/16/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Elaine M. Ferrier, Anne R. Rathe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice) (ed)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-858-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Pandolph, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2013465 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Death, #2 Exhibit B - November 2003 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit C - August 2018 Beneficiary Designation and GE's August 23, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Ms. Rathe's Claim for Life Insurance Benefits, #5 Exhibit E - November 19, 2018 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pandolph, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2020: #7 Summons - Waiver, #8 Summons - Waiver) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Rathe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne R. Rathe
Represented By: Philip L. Pettis
Represented By: Michael H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine M. Ferrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?