Gannon v. Catholic Medical Center
Plaintiff: Kerri A. Gannon
Defendant: Catholic Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv00859
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 20-cv-859-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED RECUSAL ORDER. Text of Order: I hereby recuse myself from presiding over this case. The case shall be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martha Van Oot on behalf of Catholic Medical Center Attorney Martha Van Oot added to party Catholic Medical Center(pty:dft).(Van Oot, Martha)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Weiss Ford on behalf of Catholic Medical Center Attorney Debra Weiss Ford added to party Catholic Medical Center(pty:dft).(Ford, Debra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Catholic Medical Center by Kerri A. Gannon. Served/Mailed on 8/19/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Catholic Medical Center. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice, #3 Assignment to Magistrate) (mc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (mc)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
August 12, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-859-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2013466 filed by Kerri A. Gannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Waiver of Service)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannon v. Catholic Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri A. Gannon
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Medical Center
Represented By: Martha Van Oot
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?